Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/08/2021 | Filed |