Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0884 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022