Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 225
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 225
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Education; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|