Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0892 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022