|
06/09/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-175
|
|
|
|
06/08/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 871
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (224668)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|