Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0914 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022