House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|