Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022