|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-33
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/29/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 699
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|