Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0934 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022