Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 375
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 375
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/25/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|