Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022