Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/25/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/16/2021 | Filed |