Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0942 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022