House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|