Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0944 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022