|
06/09/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-176
|
|
|
|
06/08/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 981
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (163574)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/17/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|