Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0962 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022