|
06/06/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-167
|
|
|
|
06/03/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/17/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|