Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0968 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022