Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/18/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|