Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022