03/09/2022 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Substituted for HM 641 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/22 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Finance and Tax; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/18/2021 | Filed |