Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0982 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022