Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died on Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | CS by Transportation read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/18/2021 | Filed |