Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0990 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2022