Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1097
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 1097
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|