Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2022