|
03/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-12
|
|
|
|
03/07/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 567
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (113284)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Agriculture read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
CS by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|