Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill January 27, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 13, 2022