Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 543
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 543
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/22/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|