Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1010 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022