Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022