House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (579878)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|