Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1016 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 10, 2022