Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 741
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 741
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/11/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|