Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022