Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1099
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 1099
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|