Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1026 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 20, 2022