Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|