Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022