|
06/08/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 907
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (366380)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Transportation; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/23/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|