Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1038 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022