|
03/16/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-16
|
|
|
|
03/15/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/14/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 83, NAYS 31
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 403671 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 686381 not allowed for consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 911801 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 499457 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 531515 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (115190, 893130)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/24/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|