LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1048
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1048
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1048
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
November 24, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 3, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 10, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
February 14, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
February 11, 2022
Analysis
February 8, 2022
Analysis
January 26, 2022
Analysis
January 25, 2022
Analysis
January 11, 2022
Analysis
January 10, 2022