|
03/22/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-17
|
|
|
|
03/22/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/21/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (451514)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Education; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|