Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1054 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022