Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 461
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 461
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Education; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|