Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022