Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022